He resigned from the cabinet on February 16, 2012, following allegations of government funds misappropriation.
More about Prof. Kiddu Makubuya:
- Background: Prof. Kiddu Makubuya was a distinguished Ugandan lawyer, politician, and academic.
- Ministerial roles: He served as the Minister for General Duties in the Office of the Prime Minister from May 27, 2011, after replacing Janat Mukwaya.
- Attorney General: From 2005 until 2011, he held the position of Uganda’s Attorney General.
- Parliamentary role: He was also the Member of Parliament for Katikamu County South in Luweero District.
- Education: Born on July 30, 1949, he earned a First Class Honours Bachelor of Laws degree from Makerere University in 1974.
- Obtained a Master of Laws and a Doctor of Juridical Science from Yale Law School in 1976 and 1979, respectively.
- Completed his Diploma in Legal Practice at the Law Development Center between 1981 and 1982.
- Enrolled as an advocate of the Uganda High Court in 1985.
Academic Career:
- Started as a special assistant at the Faculty of Law, Makerere University, in 1974.
- Promoted to lecturer in 1979, then to senior lecturer in 1982, and to associate professor in 1984.
- Partnered in the private law firm Kasolo & Khiddu Advocates.
- Constitutional Contributions: Member of the Uganda Constitutional Commission, which helped draft the 1995 Constitution of Uganda.
- Served on the Commission of Inquiry into Violations of Human Rights.
- Headed the Department of Law and Jurisprudence at Makerere University’s Faculty of Law until 1995.
- Appointed Director of the Uganda Human Rights and Peace Center in 1995.
- Political career: Entered politics in 1988 and was elected MP for Katikamu South Constituency in 1996.
- Held various ministerial positions including State Minister for Luweero Triangle, State Minister for Foreign Affairs (International Cooperation), Minister of Education and Sports, Justice Minister, and Attorney General.
- His final ministerial role was as the Minister for General Duties in the Office of the Prime Minister from January 14, 2005, until May 27, 2011.
- Administrative roles: Served in numerous administrative capacities, including as an ex-officio member of the Uganda Law Council and the Management Committee of the Law Development Centre.
- Engaged in research areas like jurisprudence, family law, international law, human rights, land law, development finance, and gender and law.